KY HB264 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 65.140 to enable payment for the purchase of goods or services by local government to be made by the party responsible; provide for documentation of purchaser disapproval; amend KRS 68.275 to authorize county judge/executive to pay claims as a requirement of state or federal law or regulation and, present those claims to fiscal court for review following payment;EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to local government payment for purchases and standing orders, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 66 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-03 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2020 |
2020-01-30 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-24 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-17 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-01-15 | House | introduced in House |