KY HB261 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 189)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 189)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.685 to make a person liable for civil penalties if he or she knowingly submits false or fraudulent claims or fails to report or remit required money, records, or property to the Kentucky Public Pensions Authority (KPPA) in order to obtain retirement benefits from any of the retirement systems administered by the KPPA; define "person" and "knowingly" for purposes of the Act; provide civil penalties, including restitution of the payments received as a result of fraud, a penalty of as much as 3 times the amount of the excess payments, a penalty of $500 for each false or fraudulent claim submitted, and recovery of all legal fees and costs of the investigation and enforcement of civil remedies; require that, at the request of the KPPA, the Attorney General investigate and enforce the provisions of this Act and may recover the reasonable costs of litigation as determined by the court and provided by KRS 48.005; provide that civil payments, costs, and interest be made payable to the State Treasurer and remitted to the KPPA for deposit in the affected systems' trusts consistent with the methods used to distribute administrative expenses between the trusts; provide that the remedies provided by this Act be separate from and cumulative to any other remedy available to the KPPA.
Title
AN ACT relating to fraud against the Kentucky Public Pensions Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Miller [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1832 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 164 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 164 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 189) |
2021-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-30 | House | received in House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 30, 2021 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-03-03 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 |
2021-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-11 | House | to State Government (H) |
2021-01-12 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-12 | House | introduced in House |