KY HB260 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 46)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 46)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 317.410 to add a definition for "endorsement" and make technical changes; amend KRS 317.420 to make technical changes and to specify that licensing under this chapter is required for barber shop advertising and to allow barbers to provide services to hospice patients or deceased persons at funeral establishments; amend KRS 317.450 to change probationary barber to apprentice barber, add requirements to apprentice skills, remove fees from statute and set through administrative regulations, allow manager or location changes, increase teacher experience to 36 months, and create a student permit and a demonstration charity event permit; amend KRS 317.460 to allow board inspection authority; amend KRS 317.470 to allow electronic publication of administrative regulations; amend KRS 317.530 to specify terms of the board's trust and agency fund; amend KRS 317.590 to clarify board functions; amend KRS 317A.010 to add definition for "esthetician," "esthetic practices school," "esthetic salon," "eyelash artistry," "makeup artistry," and "nail technology school" and make technical corrections; amend KRS 317A.020 to add esthetic practices, make technical changes, and allow the board to bring actions in its name; amend KRS 317A.030 to change the board name and include esthetic practices and nail technology; amend KRS 317A.040 to allow the board to delegate staffing decisions and make technical changes; amend KRS 317A.050 to condense similar licensing requirements, make technical changes, reduce required hours of training for estheticians and nail technicians, add estheticians provisions from KRS Chapter 317B, allow the board to automatically renew licenses, set license periods in administrative regulations, and establish permit requirements for eyelash artistry and makeup artistry; amend KRS 317A.062 to require fees to be set in administrative regulations; amend KRS 317A.070 to include permits; amend KRS 317A.080 to specify terms of the board's trust and agency fund; amend KRS 317A.090 to make technical changes and to reduce required training hours for estheticians and nail technicians; amend KRS 317A.120 to allow national examinations to be used, to require exam proctors, and to allow testing to be conducted at regional locations; amend KRS 317A.130 to make technical changes and include esthetician provisions from KRS Chapter 317B; amend KRS 317A.140 to specify board functions; amend KRS 317A.145 to allow board inspection authority; amend KRS 317A.990 to increase potential penalty amounts; amend KRS 164.945, 165A.310, 309.352, and 324B.030 to conform; amend KRS 317.430, 317.440, 317.540, 317.580, 317A.060, 317A.100, 317A.150, and 317A.155 to make technical changes; repeal KRS 317A.160, 317B.010, 317B.015, 317B.020, 317B.025, 317B.030, 317B.035, 317B.040, 317B.045, 317B.050, 317B.055, and 317B.060; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to licensed occupations, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 566 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 146 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 146 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 46) |
2018-03-20 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-20 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-20 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-20 | House | received in House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-2 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 19, 2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-21 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-0 |
2018-02-15 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 16, 2018 |
2018-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-30 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2018-01-26 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB260.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB260/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB260/vote_history.pdf |