KY HB260 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 94)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 94)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Repeal KRS 164A.337 and reenact as a new section of KRS 164.740 to 64.7911 to repurpose the Kentucky Educational Savings Plan endowment trust; amend the new section to allow the endowment trust to provide college access programs; delete reference to the Kentucky Educational Savings Plan Trust and make technical amendments; repeal KRS 164A.315, which provides for administrative support of the Kentucky Educational Savings Plan endowment trust.
Title
AN ACT relating to postsecondary student financial assistance.
Sponsors
Rep. James Kay [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 94) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-02 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-1 |
2015-02-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-23 | House | posting waived |
2015-02-05 | House | to Education (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB260.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB260/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB260/vote_history.pdf |