KY HB257 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-19 - to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 337.285 to allow peace officers in cities of the home rule class to be scheduled for 80 hours or less in a work period of 14 consecutive days under specified conditions; amend KRS 95.495 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to peace officer hours of work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 288 (Y: 69 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 69-15 |
2020-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Rules |
2020-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-16 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2020-01-14 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Cities
Cities, Home Rule Class
Collective Bargaining
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Public Officers and Employees
Workforce
Cities, Home Rule Class
Collective Bargaining
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Public Officers and Employees
Workforce