KY HB256 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-25 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-25 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 431 to allow the expungement of criminal records when a person who is a victim of identity theft has been erroneously charged with a criminal offense as a result; enumerate requirements for the expungement of the records; establish a process for an expedited order of expungement when the court determines that a person is currently facing criminal charges as a result of identity theft; provide that expunged records be deleted or removed if held by an agency or official, including law enforcement; provide retroactive application; restrict requirements for the payment of court costs or fees for persons seeking to expunge a criminal record under this section; provide that insurance companies must remit additional or higher insurance premiums if notified that a policy holder had his or her record expunged under this section; require the Administrative Office of the Courts to promulgate administrative regulations necessary to implement the section; and amend KRS 527.040 to provide that expungement of a criminal record under this section is an exception to the crime of possession of a firearm by a convicted felon.
Title
AN ACT relating to victims of identity theft.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with committee amendment (1) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | posting waived |
2016-02-19 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2016-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 12, 2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-19 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-01-14 | House | introduced in House |