KY HB256 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 67)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-10)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 67)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 148 to establish the Iraq/Afghanistan War Memorial Committee for purposes of establishing the Iraq/Afghanistan War Memorial; establish the Iraq/Afghanistan War Memorial Fund to be administered by the Tourism, Arts and Heritage Cabinet.
Title
AN ACT relating to veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Royce Adams [D] | Rep. Larry Clark [D] | Rep. Hubert Collins [D] | Rep. Leslie Combs [D] |
Rep. Tim Couch [R] | Rep. Ron Crimm [R] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] |
Rep. Theodore Edmonds [D] | Rep. David Floyd [R] | Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. Jeff Greer [D] |
Rep. Keith Hall [D] | Rep. Dennis Horlander [D] | Rep. Dennis Keene [D] | Rep. Martha King [D] |
Rep. Thomas McKee [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Rep. Lonnie Napier [R] |
Sen. Mike Nemes [R] | Rep. David Osborne [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] |
Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. John Short [D] | Rep. Rita Smart [D] | Rep. Fitz Steele [D] |
Rep. Wilson Stone [D] | Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] | Rep. John Tilley [D] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 67) | |
2012-03-30 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-30 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2012-03-28 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2012-03-28 | received in House | |
2012-03-27 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2012-03-27 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 27, 2012 | |
2012-03-23 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-22 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-02-29 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2012-02-27 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-24 | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-22 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2012 | |
2012-02-21 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-08 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-17 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) | |
2012-01-12 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB256.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB256/bill.doc |