KY HB255 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 141.010 to allow an exclusion for health insurance premiums that are deductible pursuant to federal legislation enacted during 2010.
Title
AN ACT relating to a health insurance tax exclusion, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Will Coursey [D] | Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Adam Koenig [R] | Rep. Jimmie Lee [D] |
Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Arnold Simpson [D] | Rep. Alecia Webb-Edgington [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-04 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-04 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-04 | received in House | |
2011-03-04 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2011-03-03 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 4, 2011 | |
2011-03-03 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2011-02-28 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-02-28 | 2nd reading | |
2011-02-28 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-02-25 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-02-25 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-25 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-02-15 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2011-02-11 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-11 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | |
2011-02-09 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 11, 2011 | |
2011-02-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-02 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-01 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB255.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB255/bill.doc |