KY HB246 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 105)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 105)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 109.041 to prohibit a county or waste management district from prohibiting or restricting materials recovery by a city in a county containing a consolidated local government; prohibit the consolidated local government or waste management district from hindering, delaying, impairing, prohibiting, or impeding a city or its contractors from utilizing a solid waste management facility; prohibit a county or waste management district from levying a fee that is based on the composition of the solid waste stream of the city if the waste stream is in conformity with state and federal law for the use of the solid waste management facility receiving the waste; amend KRS 109.115 to provide for the mayoral appointment of a seven-member board of directors of a waste management district for a county containing a consolidated local government and to restrict current appointment language to other counties; establish a two-year term for directors and require appointment of new board; amend KRS 109.120 to require that waste management district rules and regulations in counties containing a consolidated local government be approved by the appropriate legislative body; provide that rules and regulations of a district that were adopted prior to the effective date of this Act shall sunset on August 31, 2017, unless reauthorize by the new board; require that districts make notices, meeting agenda's and minutes available on a Web site operated by the consolidated local government; declare offices of board in county containing a consolidated local government vacant; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to solid waste management and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Miller [R] | Rep. Steven Riggs [D] | Rep. Kevin Bratcher [R] | Rep. Ken Fleming [R] |
Rep. Phil Moffett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 105) |
2017-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | House | Bill passed 60-30 |
2017-03-15 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2017-03-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2017-03-15 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-15 | House | received in House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 23-15 with floor amendment (1) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2017-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2017-03-07 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 66-29 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2) |
2017-02-21 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2017-02-16 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2017-02-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 22, 2017 |
2017-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2017-02-14 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-09 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | introduced in House |