KY HB243 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 174)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 16.065 to require the Department of Kentucky State Police to provide personal protection to a recipient of the Medal of Honor who is a Kentucky resident, attending any public event or ceremony to which he or she received an official written invitation, and representing for no reason other than being a recipient of the Medal of Honor, not to exceed six events per year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the protection of Medal of Honor recipients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 355 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1000 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 199 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 174)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housepassed 90-0
2019-03-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-14Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-14Houseto Rules (H)
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-12Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-12Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill
2019-03-06Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-03-06Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2019-03-06Senate1st reading
2019-03-06Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2019-03-04Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-01House3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-28Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019
2019-02-28House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-27Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-15Houseposted in committee
2019-02-07Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2019-02-06Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback