KY HB243 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.20-020 to provide that any insured named in the policy, rather than the named insured, may reject uninsured motor vehicle coverage and provide that if a named insured rejected coverage, in addition to coverage provided in or supplemental to renewal, the insurer is not required to provide coverage supplemental to a reinstatement, substitute, replacement, or amended policy issued to the same named insured by the same insurer or its affiliates.
Title
AN ACT relating to uninsured motor vehicle coverage.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Bart Rowland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-23 | House | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-12 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 17, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | introduced in House |