KY HB242 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 094)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 094)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.020, 304.2-020, and 304.2-063 to delete the Property and Casualty Division and the Health and Life Division of the Department of Insurance; establish the Division of Insurance Product Regulation and the Division of Administrative Services; rename the Consumer Protection Division the Division of Consumer Protection; authorize the commissioner of the Department of Insurance to apply for a state innovation waiver under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and implement any state plan proposed under an approved waiver.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Department of Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 094) |
2017-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-14 | House | passed 64-28 |
2017-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2017-03-07 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute for Tuesday, March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-06 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-06 | House | received in House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute |
2017-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 6, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-21 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 64-33 |
2017-02-16 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2017 |
2017-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-09 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | introduced in House |