KY HB242 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 433.890 relating to the purchase of metals by recyclers to require signed proof of ownership or authorization to sell any metal which has been smelted, burned, or melted.
Title
AN ACT relating to metals.
Sponsors
Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Tanya Pullin [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
Rep. Rita Smart [D] | Rep. Alecia Webb-Edgington [R] | Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | signed by Governor | |
2011-02-28 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-02-28 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-02-28 | received in House | |
2011-02-28 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2011-02-28 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 28, 2011 | |
2011-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | to Natural Resources and Energy (S) | |
2011-02-11 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-11 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | |
2011-02-10 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 11, 2011 | |
2011-02-10 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-09 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-02 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) | |
2011-02-01 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB242.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB242/bill.doc |