KY HB240 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]

Summary

Propose to amend the Constitution of Kentucky to abolish the office of constable; submit to the voters of the Commonwealth for approval or disapproval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT proposing to amend the Constitution of Kentucky relating to the office of constable.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-23 recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2012-03-23 taken from the Regular Orders of the Day
2012-02-23 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2012
2012-02-15 2nd reading, to Rules
2012-02-14 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2012-01-26 posted in committee
2012-01-12 to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2012-01-11 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback