KY HB239 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 21A, relating to the Supreme Court, to request that the Supreme Court institute at least one pilot project in each Supreme Court District to provide for opening or limited opening of cases in Family Court, Circuit Court, or District Court relating to abuse, neglect and dependency proceedings, and termination of parental rights proceedings, exclusive of sexual abuse proceedings; permit the court to set requirements for attendance and prohibit release of names or other identifying information relating to parties or witnesses; provide that the project is to be for four years, with annual reports to the Supreme Court, the Legislative Research Commission, and the Interim Joint Committees on Health and Welfare and Judiciary with results of the project and recommendations relating thereto; create a new section of KRS Chapter 610, relating to juvenile procedure, to permit pilot project courts to open proceedings which otherwise would be closed.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Court of Justice.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Thomas Burch [D] | Rep. Larry Clark [D] | Rep. Robert Damron [D] |
Rep. James Glenn [D] | Rep. Derrick Graham [D] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] |
Rep. Sannie Overly [D] | Rep. Darryl Owens [D] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Steven Riggs [D] |
Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Rita Smart [D] | Rep. John Stacy [D] | Rep. Fitz Steele [D] |
Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] | Rep. John Tilley [D] | Rep. Ben Waide [R] | Rep. Jim Wayne [D] |
Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2012-02-27 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-24 | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-23 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2012 | |
2012-02-23 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-22 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-01-30 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-12 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2012-01-11 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB239.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB239/bill.doc |