KY HB238 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 257.210 to remove residency requirement for the state veterinarian; make technical corrections, amend KRS 257.240 to remove residency requirement for the deputy state veterinarian; make technical corrections; EMERGENCY

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the deputy and state veterinarian and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 19 (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24Senateto Agriculture (S)
2020-01-22Senatereceived in Senate
2020-01-21House3rd reading, passed 69-20 with floor amendment (1)
2020-01-16Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2020-01-16Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 17, 2020
2020-01-16House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-15Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-13Houseposted in committee
2020-01-13Houseto Agriculture (H)
2020-01-09Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback