KY HB238 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - recommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - recommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS 224.50 to define "cabinet," "department," "permanent drop off box," "prescription drugs and medicines," "prescription drug recycling," "safe drop off drugs program," and "secure collection site"; require the Energy and Environment Cabinet to work with waste coordinators and city, county, and sheriffs offices to establish a prescription drugs drop off program; make the contents of the box that receives the prescription drugs and medicines the property of the cabinet; require the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations for the collection of the prescription drugs and medicines, the method for haulers to pick up and dispose of the wastes, and the method of disposal for prescription drugs and medicines to ensure they do not leach into the waters of the Commonwealth; require the cabinet to work with pharmaceutical companies to develop a prescription drug and medicine recycling program; require police officers of the city, county, or sheriff's office participating in the program to determine the secure collection site within the police station, post signage for the public, monitor the prescription drugs and medicines deposited into the permanent box, and inform the cabinet of pick up needs; amend KRS 224.43-310 to require the cabinet to include a description of cities and counties participating in the safe drop off drugs program in the solid waste management report to the Legislative Research Commission and the Governor; amend KRS 224.43-315 to require counties to report to the cabinet on participation in the safe drop off drugs program; amend KRS 224.43-505 to allow a portion of the remediation fee to go for grants for the safe drop off drugs program; include the safe drop off drug program grants under the general solid waste grant requirements; amend KRS 224.43-710 to include a safe drop off drugs program under the list of eligible types of technical assistance from the cabinet.
Title
AN ACT relating to the safe disposal of prescription medications and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | recommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2012-03-23 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-22 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-20 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2012-03-16 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-15 | 3rd reading, passed 88-4 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1-title) | |
2012-03-13 | taken from Committee, placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2012 | |
2012-03-12 | floor amendment (1-title) filed | |
2012-03-12 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-03-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-08 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-12 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) | |
2012-01-11 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB238.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB238/bill.doc |