KY HB237 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-13)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 532.130, 532.135, and 532.140 to add a diagnosis of serious mental illness to the disabilities which prevent execution for persons convicted of capital offenses.
Title
AN ACT relating to mental illness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-01-17 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-13 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | introduced in House |