KY HB237 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 19)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 411 to define "apparently fit grocery product," "apparently wholesome food," "donate," "food," "gleaner," "grocery product," "intentional misconduct," "nonprofit organization," and "person"; establish legal immunity protections related to apparently wholesome or fit food and grocery product donations to nonprofit organizations; extend protections to those who allow the collection or gleaning of products for donation to nonprofit organizations; allow nonprofit organizations to recondition certain donated food or products; repeal KRS 413.247 and 413.248.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to donations of food and grocery products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 19)
2017-03-06Housedelivered to Governor
2017-03-06Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2017-03-06Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2017-03-03Housereceived in House
2017-03-03Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2017-03-03Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017
2017-03-01Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-28Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2017-02-24Senateto Agriculture (S)
2017-02-23Senatereceived in Senate
2017-02-22House3rd reading, passed 96-0
2017-02-16Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 22, 2017
2017-02-16House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-15Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2017-02-14Houseposted in committee
2017-02-09Houseto Agriculture (H)
2017-02-07Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback