KY HB236 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 250.355 to allow the Department of Agriculture to establish hemp testing procedures; create a new section of KRS 260.850 to 260.869 to set forth requirements for the transportation of hemp or hemp products; amend KRS 260.850 and 260.852, 260.860, 260.864, and 260.866 to make technical corrections; amend KRS 260.858 to specify unlawful conduct; amend KRS 260.862 to specify licensure requirements; repeal KRS 260.867; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to hemp and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Koch [R] | Rep. Lynn Bechler [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] |
Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Phillip Pratt [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] |
Rep. Steve Sheldon [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 59 (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 1176 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 18 (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 1176 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 18 (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 1) |
2020-02-04 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-02-04 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-02-04 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-02-03 | House | passed 85-4 |
2020-02-03 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2020-02-03 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-03 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | to Rules (H) |
2020-01-31 | House | received in House |
2020-01-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-01-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 30, 2020 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-24 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-01-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 70-17 |
2020-01-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 17, 2020 |
2020-01-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-13 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | introduced in House |