KY HB236 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.352 to allow a high school student enrolled in the district to be appointed to the superintendent screening committee.
Title
AN ACT relating to superintendent screening committee membership.
Sponsors
Rep. Derrick Graham [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Cluster Howard [D] | Rep. James Kay [D] |
Rep. Russ Meyer [D] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | passed with floor amendments (3) (4-title) (6) and (7) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | floor amendments (1) (2-title) and (5-title) withdrawn |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | floor amendment (7) filed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | Senate | floor amendments (1) (2-title) (3) (4-title) (5-title) and (6) filed |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-03-02 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-5 |
2015-02-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-23 | House | posting waived |
2015-02-05 | House | to Education (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | introduced in House |