KY HB234 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-13 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-13 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 139.480 to exempt from sales and use tax poultry for use in the production of food for human consumption; exempt poultry or livestock bedding materials purchased on and after August 1, 2016, but before July 31, 2020, to facilitate the removal of poultry and livestock manure within the confines of an on-farm poultry or on-farm livestock facility; EFFECTIVE August 1, 2016.
Title
AN ACT relating to sales and use tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-13 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB234.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB234/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB234/FN.pdf |