KY HB232 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 84)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 84)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 365 to require consumer notification when a data breach reveals personally identifiable information.
Title
AN ACT relating to security breach notifications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 84) |
2014-03-31 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-31 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-31 | House | passed 98-0 |
2014-03-31 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-31 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) for Monday, March 31, 2014 |
2014-03-28 | House | to Rules (H) |
2014-03-28 | House | received in House |
2014-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 28, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) as Consent |
2014-03-24 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 75-16 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) |
2014-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 7, 2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2014-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-18 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-22 | House | to Labor & Industry (H) |
2014-01-21 | House | introduced in House |