KY HB230 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new sections of KRS Chapter 217 to create definitions and establish authority and standards for expedited partner therapy.
Title
AN ACT relating to expedited partner therapy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-23 | House | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB230.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB230/bill.doc |