KY HB230 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 118A to establish the clean judicial elections fund; define terms; establish fund to distribute transfers to certified judicial candidates; provide that the Kentucky Registry of Election Finance administer the fund and promulgate necessary administrative regulations; designate that moneys in the fund be invested in accordance with regulations developed by the State Investment Commission; require the registry to publish information about campaign expenditures in the judicial campaigns of the previous year; establish requirements to be designated a certified judicial candidate and gain access to the fund; provide guidelines for distribution of funds to certified judicial candidates; direct that judicial review of any final action of the registry be expedited by the court; provide for a civil penalty up to $10,000 for an actual violation of these provisions, and a Class D felony for any knowing violation of these provisions; create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to provide that a person entitled to a state tax refund may designate on their income tax return an amount to be credited to the fund; amend KRS 21A.140 to permit the Supreme Court to allow members of the Kentucky Bar Association to contribute to the clean judicial elections fund with their bar dues; EFFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2013.
Title
AN ACT relating to public financing for judicial campaigns and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-03-23 | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-03-21 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2012 | |
2012-03-15 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-14 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-25 | reassigned to Judiciary (H) | |
2012-01-11 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2012-01-09 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB230.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB230/bill.doc |