KY HB228 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 121.150(6) to increase the limit on campaign contributions to school board candidates from $100 for individuals and $200 for organizations to $1,000.
Title
AN ACT relating to campaign finance.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Cherry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-04 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-04 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-04 | passed 94-1 | |
2011-03-04 | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-04 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-03 | received in House | |
2011-03-02 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-03-02 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 2, 2011 | |
2011-03-02 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill | |
2011-02-23 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-23 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-02-23 | 2nd reading | |
2011-02-23 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-02-22 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-02-22 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-22 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | |
2011-02-18 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-18 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 | |
2011-02-16 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2011 | |
2011-02-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-03 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-02 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2011-02-01 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB228.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB228/bill.doc |