KY HB227 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-14 - recommitted to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 278.465 to redefine "net metering"; amend KRS 278.466 to set the rate of compensation for an eligible customer-generator for electricity produced that flows to the retail supplier to be equal to the most recently approved rate by the Public Service Commission for the retail electric supplier to purchase electricity on an as-available basis from qualifying facilities with design capacities of 100 kilowatts or less; allow the retail electric supplier discretion to either carry forward or pay out the customer for excess generation during a billing period; create an exemption for customer-generators taking net metering service on July 15, 2018, to allow those customers to keep their current net metering contract or tariff rate calculation until they cease to take net metering service at the eligible premises or July 15, 2043, whichever comes first; specify that the exemption does not apply to lessees, successors, assigns, or subsequent owners of eligible premises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to net metering.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 290 (Y: 49 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 289 (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: Adopt HCS 2 RCS# 288 (Y: 49 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-14Senaterecommitted to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2018-04-14Senatetaken from the Orders of the Day
2018-04-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-04-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, April 13, 2018
2018-03-29Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-29Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-20Senatereturned to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2018-03-20Senate2nd reading
2018-03-20Senatetaken from Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2018-03-19Senatereturned to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2018-03-19Senate1st reading
2018-03-19Senatetaken from Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2018-03-16Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2018-03-15Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-14House3rd reading, passed 49-45 with Committee Substitute (2)
2018-03-14Housefloor amendment (30) filed to Committee Substitute (2)
2018-03-14Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2018
2018-03-14Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2)
2018-02-27Houserecommitted to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2018-02-27Housetaken from the Orders of the Day
2018-02-21Housefloor amendments (27) filed to Bill, (28) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (29-title) filed
2018-02-20Housefloor amendments (23) filed to HFA 21, (24) filed to HFA 22, (25) filed to Bill, (26) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-02-16Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 20, 2018
2018-02-15Housefloor amendment (21) filed to bill and floor amendment (22) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-02-13Housefloor amendments (18) and (20) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendments (17) and (19) filed to Bill
2018-02-13Housefloor amendments (3) and (4) withdrawn
2018-02-09Housefloor amendments (8), (9), (12), (14) and (16) filed to Committee Substitute and floor amendments (7), (10), (11), (13) and (15) filed to Bill
2018-02-09House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-08Housefloor amendmentst (2), (4), and (6) filed to Committee Substitute and floor amendments (1), (3) and (5) filed to Bill
2018-02-08Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2018-01-22Houseposted in committee
2018-01-22Houseto Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2018-01-22Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB227.htm
Texthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA3.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA5.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA6.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA7.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA8.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA9.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA10.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA11.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA12.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA13.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA14.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA15.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA16.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA17.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA18.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA19.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA20.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA21.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA22.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA23.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA24.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA25.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA26.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA27.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA28.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA29.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HCS2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/HFA30.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/SCS1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB227/SFA1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB227/vote_history.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback