KY HB22 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 024)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 024)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.190 to change a local board vacancy from being appointed by the chief state school officer to being appointed by a majority vote of the local board; establish a timeline and procedures of appointment; establish a procedure for a failure to make appointment by local board; make changes throughout to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to local boards of education.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Cluster Howard [D] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 240 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 905 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 38 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 905 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 38 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 024) |
2019-03-19 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2019-03-07 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-07 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-06 | House | passed 97-1 |
2019-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-05 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-04 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-04 | House | received in House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) |
2019-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-12 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to Education (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
2018-09-14 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |