KY HB22 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-24 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 26)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 446.010 to define "unmanned aircraft system"; create a new section of KRS Chapter 500 to prescribe permitted and prohibited uses of drones; provide exceptions; prohibit use of evidence obtained by a drone in violation of stated prohibitions; authorize that section to be cited as the "Citizens' Freedom from Unwarranted Surveillance Act"; create a new section of KRS Chapter 501 to clarify criminal liability for offenses committed using a drone; create a new section of KRS Chapter 525 to create the offense of obstructing an emergency responder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to public safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 251 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 502 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 24 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-24Housebecame law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 26)
2018-03-23Housefiled without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
2018-03-12Housedelivered to Governor
2018-03-12Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-12Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-09Housepassed 84-0
2018-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
2018-03-08Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute
2018-03-07Houseto Rules (H)
2018-03-07Housereceived in House
2018-03-06Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-05Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 6, 2018
2018-02-23Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-22Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-01-19Senateto Judiciary (S)
2018-01-18Senatereceived in Senate
2018-01-17House3rd reading, passed 94-0
2018-01-16Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 17, 2018
2018-01-11House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-10Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-01-08Houseposted in committee
2018-01-05Housereassigned to Judiciary (H)
2018-01-02Houseto Small Business & Information Technology (H)
2018-01-02Houseintroduced in House
2017-06-05HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback