KY HB219 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 56)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 56)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 217.177 to delete recordkeeping requirements for the sale of hypodermic syringes or needles; add provisions for the sale of hypodermic syringes or needles without a prescription including a limit of 30 syringes of needles, proof of purchaser's age of 16 years or older, information requirements to be provided to the purchaser with each sale, disposal requirements, and enforcement provisions.
Title
AN ACT relating to the practice of pharmacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1670 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 96 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 96 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 56) |
2021-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-11 | House | received in House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-02-22 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 23, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2021-01-13 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Drugs and Medicines
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Health
Substance Abuse
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Health
Substance Abuse