KY HB218 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 86)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 304.17A-142 to remove dollar amount coverage cap; to remove age limitation on coverage; to require the coverage of all health benefit plans; to add definitions; repeal KRS 304.17A-141 and 304.17A-143.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to insurance coverage for autism benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 629 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 184 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 86)
2018-03-27Housedelivered to Governor
2018-03-27Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-22Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-22Housereceived in House
2018-03-22Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2018-03-22Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018
2018-03-21Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-20Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-02-27Senateto Banking & Insurance (S)
2018-02-26Senatereceived in Senate
2018-02-23House3rd reading, passed 82-0
2018-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 23, 2018
2018-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-02-16Houseposted in committee
2018-01-23Houseto Banking & Insurance (H)
2018-01-19Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback