KY HB216 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 018)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 43.030, relating to the Auditor of Public Accounts, to limit the requirement that employees engaged in auditing or investigations must possess a four-year college degree to those with status in the classified service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the qualifications of employees of the Auditor of Public Accounts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 898 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 82 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 018)
2019-03-05Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-05Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-04Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-01Housereceived in House
2019-03-01Senate3rd reading, passed 36-0
2019-03-01Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 1, 2019
2019-02-28Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-27Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-25Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2019-02-21Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-20House3rd reading, passed 99-0
2019-02-15Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019
2019-02-15House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-14Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-11Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto State Government (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback