KY HB216 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-07 - posted in committee
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-07 - posted in committee
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 189 to prohibit smoking in a motor vehicle containing a child under the age of 17; amend KRS 189.990 to establish penalties effective January 1, 2012; set the fine for violation at $25 for the first offense and $50 for each subsequent offense; provide for a probationary period ending January 1, 2012, during which courtesy warnings will be issued.
Title
AN ACT relating to children in motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-07 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-01 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2011-01-07 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB216.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB216/bill.doc |