KY HB210 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 19)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 19)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend various sections of Subtitle 36 of KRS Chapter 304, the Kentucky Insurance Guaranty Association Act, to make technical amendments; amend scope of Act, definitions, and obligations of the Kentucky Insurance Guaranty Association.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Insurance Guaranty Association Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 266 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2588 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 59 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2588 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 59 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 19) |
2023-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-15 | House | passed 98-0 |
2023-03-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-13 | House | to Rules (H) |
2023-03-13 | House | received in House |
2023-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35 -0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2023-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-03-03 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 17, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-10 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2023-02-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-08 | House | introduced in House |