KY HB210 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 186 to require the Transportation Cabinet to issue every
Title
AN ACT relating to the operation of a motor vehicle and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-24 | floor amendments (4) and (5-title) filed | |
2011-02-17 | floor amendment (3) filed | |
2011-02-16 | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed | |
2011-02-16 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2011 | |
2011-02-16 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-15 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-11 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-01 | to Transportation (H) | |
2011-01-07 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB210.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB210/bill.doc |