KY HB209 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 032)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 032)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.162 to create a Gold Star Siblings license plate with the fees going to the veterans' program trust fund; amend KRS 186.164 to set forth eligibility requirements; EFFECTIVE 1/1/2016.
Title
AN ACT relating to special license plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 032) |
2015-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2015-03-10 | House | received in House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-02 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2015-02-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB209.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB209/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB209/vote_history.pdf |