KY HB207 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 190)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 520.010 to allow persons who are in a detention facility in a professional capacity to possess a cell phone or other personal electronic device.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to cell phones.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 764 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 356 (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 190)
2018-04-14Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-14Housereceived in House
2018-04-14Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2018-04-14Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Saturday, April 14, 2018
2018-03-27Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2018-03-22Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2018-03-22Senate1st reading
2018-03-22Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2018-03-21Senateto Judiciary (S)
2018-03-20Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-19House3rd reading, passed 83-2 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1)
2018-03-16Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-09Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2018-03-08Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 9, 2018
2018-03-08House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-07Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-01-22Houseposted in committee
2018-01-19Houseto Judiciary (H)
2018-01-17Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback