KY HB207 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 281 to establish insurance requirements for transportation network companies operating in Kentucky.
Title
AN ACT relating to insurance requirements for transportation network companies.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Chris Harris [D] | Rep. Cluster Howard [D] |
Rep. Dean Schamore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-7 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | introduced in House |