KY HB206 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 165)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 165)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 164.740 to 164.7891 to establish the Dual Credit Scholarship Program; define terms for the program, including "eligible high school student" and "participating institution"; designate the Kentucky Higher Education Assistance Authority to administer the program and require the agency to promulgate administrative regulations for the administration of the program; define student eligibility for the program; prescribe the scholarship amount calculation and maximum scholarship amount; require the authority to provide an annual report on the program; establish the Dual Credit Scholarship Program trust fund; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the dual credit scholarship program, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. John Carney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 165) |
2017-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill passed 88-0 |
2017-03-30 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-30 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-30 | House | received in House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute as a consent bill |
2017-03-15 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2017-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017 |
2017-03-06 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-09 | House | to Education (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | introduced in House |