KY HB201 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 189 to define "automated speed enforcement device," "owner," "program," and "recorded images"; direct the Transportation Cabinet to establish a pilot program for automated speed enforcement in highway work zones and issue a uniform civil citation to an operator of a motor vehicle traveling more than 10 miles per hour over the posted speed limit; establish procedures for citation issuance; direct the Transportation Cabinet to install signage and to promulgate administrative regulations to implement the program; establish civil fines for violations issued under the program; specify that all fines and penalties assessed be deposited into the automated speed enforcement fund; require the Transportation Cabinet to annually report to the Legislative Research Commission the status of the program; establish the automated speed enforcement fund; specify that moneys collected be used to defray the costs of administering the program; specify that any moneys collected in excess of program costs be deposited into the highway work zone safety fund and used for the purposes of that fund; provide that the provisions be repealed effective July 1, 2027; provide the Act may be cited as the Jared Lee Helton Act of 2023; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to highway work zones and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. Robert Duvall [R] | Rep. Kevin Jackson [R] | Rep. Shawn McPherson [R] |
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Tom Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2023-03-13 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2023-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 03, 2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-16 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2023-02-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-07 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Appropriations
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Short Titles and Popular Names
Sunset Legislation
Traffic Safety
Transportation
Appropriations
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Short Titles and Popular Names
Sunset Legislation
Traffic Safety
Transportation