KY HB201 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 208)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 208)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
The Transportation Cabinet Budget: appropriate from the General Fund, Restricted Funds, Federal Funds, and Road Fund $2,338,992,800 in fiscal year 2018-2019 and $2,318,218,000 in fiscal year 2019-2020 for operating costs; appropriate from Road Fund and Investment Income for various capital projects; require the Secretary of the Transportation Cabinet to produce a document detailing the 2018-2020 Biennial Highway Construction Program and the Highway Preconstruction Program; provide debt service to the General Administration and Support budget unit; allow reallocation of appropriations among budget units; allow the Transportation Cabinet to receive funds and services for the Adopt-A-Highway Litter Program; provide funds for Aviation's operational costs; provide debt service to the Aviation budget unit; provide funds for Economic Development Road lease-rental payments; provide that no portion of the revenues to the state Road Fund accrue to the Debt Payment Acceleration Fund account; provide debt service for Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle (GARVEE) Bonds; provide funds for the State-Supported Construction Program, Biennial Highway Construction Program, Highway Construction Contingency Account, and the Kentucky Pride Fund; authorize projects in the 2016-2018 Biennial Highway Construction Plan to continue into the 2018-2020 biennium; provide no Road Fund appropriation for the Kentucky Transportation Center; authorize the Transportation Cabinet to match federal highway moneys; prioritize projects should any additional federal highway moneys become available; authorize the Transportation Cabinet to continue the Cash Management Plan and to make programmatic adjustments; provide for carry forward of any unexpended Road Fund appropriations in the Highways budget unit for various programs; provide for the transfer of Road Fund resources for judgments; authorize the Transportation Cabinet to maximize the use of Toll Credits; provide funds for the County Road Aid Program, the Rural Secondary Program, the Municipal Road Aid Program, and the Energy Recovery Road Fund; provide debt service to the Vehicle Regulation budget unit; provide for Capital Construction Fund appropriations and reauthorizations; provide for the expiration of existing line-item capital construction projects; authorize various capital projects; specify funds transfers.
Title
AN ACT relating to appropriations providing financing and conditions for the operations, maintenance, support, and functioning of the Transportation Cabinet of the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 505 (Y: 78 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 751 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 230 (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 751 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 230 (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 208) |
2018-04-26 | House | line items vetoed |
2018-04-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-14 | House | Bill passed 78-11 |
2018-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-04-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-04-14 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2018-04-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-04-14 | House | received in House |
2018-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Saturday, April 14, 2018 |
2018-04-14 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2018-03-16 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 1st reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | reassigned to Transportation (S) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 78-16 with Committee Substitute |
2018-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-16 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-02-16 | House | 1st reading |
2018-02-16 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-18 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-16 | House | introduced in House |