KY HB201 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 48)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 48)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 382.520 to provide that a loan secured by a real estate mortgage shall secure payment of all interest rate modifications, rather than interest rate reductions.
Title
AN ACT relating to loans secured by a real estate mortgage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 48) |
2015-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-11 | House | received in House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-09 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 9, 2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-26 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2015-02-12 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 13, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 17, 2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB201.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB201/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB201/vote_history.pdf |