KY HB201 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 24A.230 and 24A.290 to increase the jurisdictional limit of the small claims division of District Court from $1,500 to $2,500, for both claims and counterclaims.
Title
AN ACT relating to jurisdictional limits for Kentucky courts.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas McKee [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Carl Rollins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-22 | floor amendment (3) filed | |
2011-02-17 | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2011 | |
2011-02-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-07 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-07 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2011-01-06 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB201.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB201/bill.doc |