KY HB200 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 169)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 169)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
The State/Executive Branch Budget: Detail Part I, Operating Budget; appropriate to General Government: 2017-2018: $7,018,500, 2018-2019: $1,704,291,300, 2019-2020: $1,655,441,200; appropriate to the Economic Development Cabinet: 2018-2019: $31,672,600, 2019-2020: $32,384,800; appropriate to the Department of Education: 2018-2019: $4,885,519,300, 2019-2020: $4,885,920,600; appropriate to the Education and Workforce Development Cabinet: 2018-2019: $630,653,700, 2019-2020: $635,306,400; appropriate to the Energy and Environment Cabinet: 2018-2019: $272,522,400, 2019-2020: $280,337,000; appropriate to the Finance and Administration Cabinet: 2018-2019: $932,955,700, 2019-2020: $962,132,700; appropriate to the Health and Family Services Cabinet: 2017-2018: $12,064,200, 2018-2019: $13,902,025,100, 2019-2020: $14,153,724,700; appropriate to the Justice and Public Safety Cabinet: 2017-2018: $22,281,300, 2018-2019: $1,279,407,200, 2019-2020: $1,315,928,100; appropriate to the Labor Cabinet: 2018-2019: $221,768,700, 2019-2020: $221,427,400; appropriate to the Personnel Cabinet: 2018-2019: $66,174,600, 2019-2020: $66,486,800; appropriate to Postsecondary Education: 2018-2019: $7,834,090,600, 2019-2020: $8,200,114,600; appropriate to the Public Protection Cabinet: 2018-2019: $123,723,400, 2019-2020: $122,273,100; appropriate to the Tourism, Arts and Heritage Cabinet: 2017-2018: $8,831,600, 2018-2019: $258,238,600, 2019-2020: $261,409,800; appropriate to the Budget Reserve Trust Fund: 2018-2019: $62,414,100, 2019-2020: $183,378,000; not included in the appropriation amounts are capital project amounts as follows: 2017-2018 $16,500,000, 2018-2019: $2,804,425,500, 2019-2020: $342,579,500; detail Part II, Capital Projects Budget; detail Part III, General Provisions; detail Part IV, State Salary/Compensation, Benefit, and Employment Policy; detail Part V, Funds Transfer; detail Part VI, General Fund Budget Reduction Plan; detail Part VII, General Fund Surplus Expenditure Plan; detail Part VIII, Road Fund Budget Reduction Plan; detail Part IX, Road Fund Surplus Expenditure Plan; detail Part X, Phase I Tobacco Settlement; and detail Part XI, Executive Branch Budget Summary.
Title
AN ACT relating to appropriations and revenue measures providing financing and conditions for the operations, maintenance, support, and functioning of the government of the Commonwealth of Kentucky and its various officers, cabinets, departments, boards, commissions, institutions, subdivisions, agencies, and other state-supported activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Rudy [R] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. Suzanne Miles [R] |
Rep. David Osborne [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override RSN# 715 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 473 (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 455 (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 691 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 577 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 202 (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 201 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 473 (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 455 (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 691 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 577 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 202 (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 201 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-14 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 169) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-13 | Senate | received in House |
2018-04-13 | House | Bill passed 26-12 |
2018-04-13 | House | veto overridden |
2018-04-13 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto for Friday, April 13, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | House | to Rules (S) |
2018-04-13 | House | received in Senate |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Bill passed 66-28 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | veto overridden |
2018-04-13 | Senate | posted for consideration of Governor's veto |
2018-04-13 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2018-04-13 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | received in House |
2018-04-09 | House | vetoed |
2018-04-02 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-02 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill passed 59-36 |
2018-04-02 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2018-04-02 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report |
2018-04-02 | House | taken from Rules |
2018-04-02 | House | Free Conference Committee report filed in House |
2018-04-02 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-04-02 | House | received in House |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Bill passed 25-13 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2018-04-02 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report for Monday, April 2, 2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report filed in Senate |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1) on Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-21 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-03-21 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-21 | House | taken from Rules |
2018-03-21 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-21 | House | received in House |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 26-11 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2018-03-16 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 1st reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 76-15 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1) |
2018-03-01 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 1, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-28 | House | reported favorably with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-16 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-02-16 | House | 1st reading |
2018-02-16 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-18 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-01-16 | House | introduced in House |