KY HB200 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 525.130, relating to cruelty to animals in the second degree, to allow a court to order an offender to pay restitution for the upkeep of a horse involved in the offense and terminate the offender's interest in the horse involved in the offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to orders of restitution and forfeiture following a criminal conviction of cruelty to animals in the second degree.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15Housedelivered to Governor
2017-03-15Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2017-03-15Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2017-03-15Housereceived in House
2017-03-15Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2017-03-15Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017
2017-03-08Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2017-03-07Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2017-03-06Senateto Agriculture (S)
2017-03-06Senatereceived in Senate
2017-03-03House3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute
2017-03-03Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017
2017-03-02Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017
2017-03-02House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-03-01Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
2017-02-27Houseposted in committee
2017-02-21Houseto Agriculture (H)
2017-02-16Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback