KY HB200 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Enrolled on February 24 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on February 24 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 42 to require the creation of a plaque to honor Kentucky Congressional Medal of Honor recipients; require the Department for Facilities and Support Services to design, install, and provide routine maintenance of the plaque.
Title
AN ACT relating to the commemoration of Kentucky Medal of Honor recipients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | signed by Governor | |
2011-02-28 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-02-28 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2011-02-24 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2011-02-24 | received in House | |
2011-02-23 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 | |
2011-02-23 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 23, 2011 | |
2011-02-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-11 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2011-02-09 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-08 | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with floor amendment (1) | |
2011-02-03 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2011-02-03 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 4, 2011 | |
2011-02-03 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-01-07 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-07 | to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H) | |
2011-01-06 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB200.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB200/bill.doc |