KY HB2 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 9 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-01-09 - delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 15.241 to allow the Attorney General to seek injunctive relief as well as civil and criminal penalties to prevent, penalize, and remedy violations of KRS Chapter 216B relating to abortion facilities, violations of KRS 311.710 to 311.830 relating to abortions, and violations of emergency management orders relating to elective medical procedures issued under KRS Chapter 39A; specify that nothing in this section shall limit or preclude the secretary of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services from seeking similar relief; create a noncodified section to prohibit an abortion facility from deeming an abortion to be an emergent or urgent medical procedure and to prohibit a physician from deeming an abortion to be performed in an abortion facility to be an emergent or urgent medical procedure during the state of emergency declared in response to COVID-19; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to medical procedures and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1505 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 12 (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-09Housedelivered to Governor
2021-01-09Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2021-01-09Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2021-01-09Housereceived in House
2021-01-09Senate3rd reading, passed 30-5
2021-01-08Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Saturday, January 9, 2021
2021-01-08Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2021-01-07Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2021-01-07Senate1st reading
2021-01-07Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2021-01-07Senateto Judiciary (S)
2021-01-07Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2021-01-07Senatereceived in Senate
2021-01-07House3rd reading, passed 75-18
2021-01-06Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 7, 2021
2021-01-06Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2021-01-05Houseposting waived
2021-01-05Housereturned to Judiciary (H)
2021-01-05House1st reading
2021-01-05Housetaken from Judiciary (H)
2021-01-05Houseto Judiciary (H)
2021-01-05Houseintroduced in House
2020-12-03HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback