KY HB2 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 75)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 17.500 to add offenses to what qualifies as a sex crime; amend KRS 49.370 to state that a human trafficking victim's cooperation shall not disqualify the victim from a claim; create a new section of KRS Chapter 183 to require airports to post a human trafficking hotline in publicly accessible bathrooms; create a new section of KRS Chapter 277 to require passenger train stations to post a human trafficking hotline in publicly accessible bathrooms; create a new section of KRS Chapter 281 to require truck stops to post a human trafficking hotline in publicly accessible bathrooms; amend KRS 529.010 to create new definitions related to human trafficking; amend KRS 529.100 to specifically list the elements of human trafficking; amend KRS 529.130 to state that $10,000 is the minimum fine to be paid to the human trafficking victims fund for a conviction of human trafficking; amend KRS 529.140 to add to the list of functions that may be funded by the human traffikcing victims fund; amend KRS 529.180 to list defenses that are not available to a defendant charged with human trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to human trafficking and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1415 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 197 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02Housesigned by Governor (Acts ch. 75)
2020-03-26Housedelivered to Governor
2020-03-26Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-26Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-26Housereceived in House
2020-03-26Senate3rd reading, passed 33-0
2020-03-26Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 26, 2020
2020-03-19Senatereported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
2020-03-18Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2020-03-18Senate2nd reading
2020-03-18Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2020-03-17Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2020-03-17Senate1st reading
2020-03-17Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2020-03-12Senateto Judiciary (S)
2020-03-10Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-09House3rd reading, passed 87-0
2020-03-05Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 6, 2020
2020-03-05House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-03-02Houseposted in committee
2020-03-02Houseto Judiciary (H)
2020-02-27Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback