KY HB2 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 073)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 620 to establish a custodial, permanancy, and service option assistance program for relative and fictive kin caegivers; amend KRS 405.023 to establish that the KinCare Support Program shall include respite care for low-income fictive kin caregivers; amend KRS 605.120 to delete requirement related to theKinship Care Program; amend KRS 610.010 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to relative and fictive kin caregivers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1015 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 139 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 138 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 073)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-03-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-12Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-07Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-07Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-06Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2019-03-05Senatereturned to Health & Welfare (S)
2019-03-05Senate1st reading
2019-03-05Senatetaken from Health & Welfare (S)
2019-03-01Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2019-02-27Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-26House3rd reading, passed 97-0 with floor amendment (1)
2019-02-26Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-22House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-21Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-19Houseposted in committee
2019-02-14Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-02-13Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback