KY HB2 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 002)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 002)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 311.710 to 311.820 to create the Ultrasound Informed Consent Act to require an ultrasound prior to an abortion; amend KRS 311.990 to provide a criminal penalty; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to full disclosure in public safety and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Hoover [R] | Rep. Addia Wuchner [R] | Rep. Lynn Bechler [R] | Rep. Danny Bentley [R] |
Rep. Robert Benvenuti [R] | Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. Kevin Bratcher [R] | Rep. John Carney [R] |
Sen. Matt Castlen [R] | Rep. Jim Duplessis [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Richard Heath [R] |
Rep. Gary Herald [R] | Rep. Kenny Imes [R] | Rep. Dan Johnson [R] | Rep. DJ Johnson [R] |
Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Adam Koenig [R] | Rep. Stan Lee [R] | Rep. David Meade [R] |
Sen. Robert Mills [R] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] | Rep. David Osborne [R] |
Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Jonathan Shell [R] |
Rep. Diane St Onge [R] | Rep. Walker Thomas [R] | Rep. James Tipton [R] | Rep. Tommy Turner [R] |
Rep. Ken Upchurch [R] | Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 002) |
2017-01-07 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2017-01-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-01-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-01-07 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-01-07 | House | received in House |
2017-01-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-5 |
2017-01-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Saturday, January 7, 2017 |
2017-01-07 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2017-01-06 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2017-01-06 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-01-06 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2017-01-05 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2017-01-05 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-01-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-01-05 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-01-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-01-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 83-12 with Committee Substitute |
2017-01-05 | House | floor amendmenst (6) & (7-title) filed, and floor amendments (8) & (9) filed to Committee Substitute |
2017-01-05 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 5, 2017 |
2017-01-05 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2017-01-05 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2017-01-04 | House | floor amendments (1) (2) (3-title) (4-title) and (5) filed |
2017-01-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 5, 2017 |
2017-01-04 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-01-03 | House | posting waived |
2017-01-03 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2017-01-03 | House | 1st reading |
2017-01-03 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2017-01-03 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2017-01-03 | House | introduced in House |